U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:94-cr-00038-4
  • Case Name: USA v. Fullwood et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • December 15, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 05, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 22, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
August, 2016
  • August 17, 2016: [Order]
  • August 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Letter]
January, 2016
  • January 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • January 06, 2016: [Document re Reduction of Sentence re: Crack Cocaine 18:3582]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 16, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 14, 2015: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
August, 2015
  • August 10, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2014
  • November 03, 2014: [Order Returning Submission]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.