U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:99-cr-00266-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Richards et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 12, 2018: [Amended Judgment]
  • June 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 11, 2018: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • June 11, 2018: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 08, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 08, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 07, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 04, 2018: [Order]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [2255 Motion Filed]
March, 2016
  • March 18, 2016: [USM Return Unexecuted]
January, 2016
  • January 13, 2016: [USM Return Unexecuted]
  • January 11, 2016: [Order]
  • January 05, 2016: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • January 05, 2016: [Arrest - Other District]
November, 2014
  • November 04, 2014: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.