U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00211-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rogers
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • September 24, 2021: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Transcript]
  • April 23, 2021: [Sealed Transcript]
May, 2020
  • May 13, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • May 13, 2020: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • May 13, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 12, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • May 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • May 07, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • May 06, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • May 06, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
  • May 06, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 05, 2020: [Order to Show Cause]
  • May 04, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • May 04, 2020: [Seal]
  • May 04, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • May 01, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 17, 2018: [Sealed Order]
  • April 17, 2018: [Restitution Order]
  • April 17, 2018: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • April 17, 2018: [Judgment]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 12, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 12, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • April 12, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order]
  • April 12, 2018: [Seal]
  • April 12, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 06, 2018: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • April 03, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
January, 2018
  • January 03, 2018: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • January 03, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2017
  • December 12, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 27, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
November, 2015
  • November 03, 2015: [Order of Transfer]
August, 2015
  • August 20, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
July, 2015
  • July 24, 2015: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • July 24, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • July 23, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 23, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
  • July 22, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
  • July 13, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 13, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
June, 2015
  • June 16, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
November, 2014
  • November 07, 2014: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.