U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:09-cr-00118-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Griffin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Transcript]
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • July 13, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • July 13, 2020: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • July 10, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 09, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • July 07, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • July 07, 2020: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • July 07, 2020: [Violation Report]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Transcript]
  • November 15, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 15, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Order]
  • June 11, 2019: [Order of Transfer]
May, 2019
  • May 10, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2019
  • March 13, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 11, 2019: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 07, 2019: [Transcript]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 20, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 20, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • February 14, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • February 13, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • February 13, 2019: [Violation Report]
  • February 13, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • June 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
April, 2018
  • April 02, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • April 02, 2018: [Hearing ]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 28, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 28, 2018: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 28, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • February 28, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • February 28, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 28, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • February 26, 2018: [Calendar Entry]
  • February 15, 2018: [Revocation of Probation/Supervised Release]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [Transcript]
June, 2016
  • June 20, 2016: [2255 Motion Filed]
November, 2014
  • November 10, 2014: [Presentence Investigation Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.