U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00218-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rodriguez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 15, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 09, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 04, 2022: [Calendar Entry]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • November 03, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • November 03, 2022: [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
  • November 03, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 03, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 03, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • November 03, 2022: [Information - Felony]
May, 2021
  • May 04, 2021: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Transcript]
May, 2016
  • May 02, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • May 02, 2016: [Judgment]
April, 2016
  • April 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • April 19, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • April 19, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 11, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2016
  • February 17, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • February 17, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 04, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • February 04, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 04, 2016: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • February 04, 2016: [Arrest - Other District]
January, 2016
  • January 25, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 06, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
October, 2015
  • October 20, 2015: [Order of Transfer]
  • October 20, 2015: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 16, 2015: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • October 16, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 13, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 05, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
August, 2015
  • August 12, 2015: [Order on Sealed Motion]
July, 2015
  • July 24, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
November, 2014
  • November 13, 2014: [Calendar Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.