U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:09-cr-00085-16
  • Case Name: USA v. Torres-Rios et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 26, 2021: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
March, 2020
  • March 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2019
  • April 11, 2019: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • April 01, 2019: [Summons Issued]
February, 2019
  • February 01, 2019: [Calendar Entry]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • January 29, 2019: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2018
  • February 14, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [Letter]
  • July 12, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • June 28, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • June 12, 2017: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • June 09, 2017: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • June 01, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 01, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • June 01, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • May 19, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • May 19, 2017: [Violation Report]
  • May 08, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 19, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • April 19, 2017: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
  • April 13, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • April 13, 2017: [Violation Report]
March, 2017
  • March 17, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • February 21, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • February 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • February 21, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 21, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 17, 2017: [Order]
  • February 14, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
  • February 14, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 14, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • February 14, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • February 14, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 14, 2017: [Pretrial Detention]
October, 2016
  • October 12, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2015
  • February 02, 2015: [Order]
December, 2014
  • December 29, 2014: [Miscellaneous Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • December 23, 2014: [Appoint Counsel re Reduction of Sentence - USSC Amendment]
November, 2014
  • November 13, 2014: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.