U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00210-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Maslar
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Transcript]
September, 2015
  • September 03, 2015: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
August, 2015
  • August 26, 2015: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • August 21, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • August 14, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • August 14, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 14, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 14, 2015: [Seal]
July, 2015
  • July 01, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 30, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • June 29, 2015: [Order]
November, 2014
  • November 13, 2014: [Calendar Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.