U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:11-cr-00139-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lopez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • October 31, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 31, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • August 25, 2021: [Violation Report]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 05, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 23, 2018: [Order of Transfer]
  • February 22, 2018: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 09, 2017: [Order]
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 04, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2014
  • November 18, 2014: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.