U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:00-cr-00044-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Baldwin et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
August, 2021
  • August 10, 2021: [Early Termination of Probation]
September, 2020
  • September 10, 2020: [Order Reducing Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • September 10, 2020: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • September 10, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 10, 2020: [Sentencing]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
March, 2020
  • March 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 03, 2020: [Continue ]
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 11, 2020: [Calendar Entry]
January, 2020
  • January 03, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Order]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reduction of Sentence (non-drug)]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Reply to Response]
  • May 24, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • May 09, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 25, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • April 25, 2019: [Notice]
  • April 04, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • March 29, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2019
  • February 01, 2019: [Reduce Sentence (non-drug)]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 14, 2019: [Reduce Sentence (non-drug)]
May, 2018
  • May 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • May 04, 2018: [Reply/Response Misc]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • April 25, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2016
  • March 07, 2016: [PSI Returned to USPO]
  • March 03, 2016: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
January, 2016
  • January 04, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
November, 2015
  • November 03, 2015: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2015
  • October 16, 2015: [Order]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 30, 2015: [USCA Request]
  • July 01, 2015: [Order]
January, 2015
  • January 23, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2014
  • November 18, 2014: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.