U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00225-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gonzalez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 04, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Witness List]
  • July 28, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • July 28, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • July 28, 2022: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 01, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • June 01, 2022: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 25, 2022: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • May 11, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 11, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • May 10, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 09, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 06, 2022: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • May 02, 2022: [Violation Report]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 14, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • April 14, 2022: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
  • March 18, 2022: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • March 18, 2022: [Violation Report]
  • March 02, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • February 10, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • February 10, 2022: [USM Return Executed]
  • February 10, 2022: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • February 10, 2022: [Remand]
  • February 10, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 10, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [Prob 35 Order Term Probation / SR]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • March 22, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 15, 2021: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • March 03, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 03, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • March 02, 2021: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • March 02, 2021: [Violation Report]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 25, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 20, 2021: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
  • February 08, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • February 08, 2021: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • January 13, 2021: [Compliance Review Hearing]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • December 18, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [Continue ]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 05, 2020: [Continue ]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • September 16, 2020: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • September 15, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 15, 2020: [Continue ]
  • September 14, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 14, 2020: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
  • September 10, 2020: [Calendar Entry]
  • September 10, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • September 10, 2020: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
  • September 03, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 27, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • August 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 22, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 15, 2020: [Release from Custody ]
  • June 08, 2020: [Extension of Time]
  • June 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • June 01, 2020: [Leave to File]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 27, 2020: [Order]
  • May 27, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 26, 2020: [Release from Custody ]
September, 2019
  • September 06, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 04, 2019: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • July 26, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • July 09, 2019: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • June 25, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 20, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • June 20, 2019: [Violation Report]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Continue ]
  • May 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 26, 2019: [Continue ]
  • May 09, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2019
  • January 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2018
  • November 19, 2018: [Order]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • October 30, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • October 26, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • October 26, 2018: [Violation Report]
  • October 26, 2018: [Order]
  • October 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • October 25, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 25, 2018: [USM Return Executed]
  • October 25, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 25, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • October 25, 2018: [Pretrial Detention]
  • October 25, 2018: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • October 23, 2018: [Order]
March, 2018
  • March 04, 2018: [Transcript]
January, 2018
  • January 04, 2018: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • December 08, 2017: [Bond Hearing]
  • December 06, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • December 06, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 06, 2017: [PS 8 Petition Action on Cond of PT Release]
  • December 02, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 02, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 02, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 02, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 20, 2017: [Index to Record on Appeal]
  • November 17, 2017: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • November 16, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 16, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 15, 2017: [Amended Judgment]
  • November 13, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • November 08, 2017: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • November 08, 2017: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • November 07, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • November 02, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 27, 2017: [Judgment]
  • October 26, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • October 26, 2017: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • October 25, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • October 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • October 25, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • October 25, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 25, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • October 25, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • October 25, 2017: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • October 25, 2017: [Sealed Order]
  • October 25, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • October 24, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 23, 2017: [Seal]
  • October 19, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 19, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • October 04, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • October 04, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 25, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • September 25, 2017: [Continue ]
  • September 21, 2017: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • September 20, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 20, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • September 15, 2017: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 14, 2017: [Violation Report]
  • September 14, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
August, 2017
  • August 23, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • August 23, 2017: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • August 01, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2017
  • July 13, 2017: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • July 13, 2017: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Continue ]
  • June 28, 2017: [Continue ]
  • June 23, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • June 20, 2017: [2255 Motion Filed]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • May 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • May 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 23, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 23, 2017: [Travel ]
  • May 23, 2017: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • May 08, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2017
  • March 08, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Transcript]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2016
  • October 01, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2016
  • July 08, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2016
  • June 21, 2016: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • June 17, 2016: [Judgment]
  • June 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 13, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • June 13, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 07, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 02, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • June 02, 2016: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
  • May 31, 2016: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • May 25, 2016: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • May 24, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 24, 2016: [Judgment]
  • May 20, 2016: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • May 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • May 19, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • May 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 19, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 19, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • May 16, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
  • May 16, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 13, 2016: [Continue ]
  • May 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • May 11, 2016: [Continue ]
  • May 11, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • May 10, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • May 10, 2016: [Seal]
  • May 09, 2016: [Seal]
  • May 03, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Continue ]
  • April 23, 2016: [Transcript]
  • April 20, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 18, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 06, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 04, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 24, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 24, 2016: [Continue ]
  • March 20, 2016: [Transcript]
  • March 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 07, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • March 03, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 02, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • March 01, 2016: [Judgment]
  • March 01, 2016: [Extension of Time]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • February 23, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • February 10, 2016: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • February 10, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • February 04, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 03, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 03, 2016: [Judgment]
  • February 03, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 29, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • January 29, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 29, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 29, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • January 29, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • January 29, 2016: [Judgment]
  • January 29, 2016: [2255 Motion Filed]
  • January 29, 2016: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • January 27, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 26, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 25, 2016: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • January 25, 2016: [Notice]
  • January 25, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • January 21, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 21, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • January 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 21, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • January 21, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 21, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • January 21, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 21, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • January 21, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 20, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 20, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 19, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • January 19, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • January 19, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • January 19, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • January 19, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 18, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 15, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 15, 2016: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • January 15, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 15, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 15, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • January 15, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 14, 2016: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • January 14, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 14, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • January 14, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 14, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • January 14, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 13, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 11, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 11, 2016: [PS 8 Petition Action on Cond of PT Release]
  • January 07, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 06, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 04, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • January 04, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • January 04, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • December 29, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • December 28, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 28, 2015: [Judgment]
  • December 23, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 23, 2015: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • December 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • December 23, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • December 23, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 23, 2015: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • December 21, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • December 21, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 21, 2015: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 18, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • December 18, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 17, 2015: [Continue ]
  • December 17, 2015: [Travel ]
  • December 07, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 03, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • December 03, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 02, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • December 02, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 01, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 25, 2015: [Continue ]
  • November 24, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 24, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • November 24, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 24, 2015: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 23, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • November 23, 2015: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • November 23, 2015: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • November 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • November 23, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 23, 2015: [Continue ]
  • November 20, 2015: [Continue ]
  • November 20, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 13, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • November 13, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • November 13, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 12, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 10, 2015: [Extension of Time]
  • November 10, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 06, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 05, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • November 05, 2015: [Order]
  • November 02, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 02, 2015: [Order]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Bond Hearing]
  • October 21, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 19, 2015: [PS 8 Petition Action on Cond of PT Release]
  • October 15, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 08, 2015: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 05, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 05, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 05, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 05, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 05, 2015: [Consent Form]
  • October 05, 2015: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • October 05, 2015: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • October 02, 2015: [Extension of Time]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 29, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • September 28, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 25, 2015: [Order]
  • September 25, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 25, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 25, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 25, 2015: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • September 25, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 25, 2015: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • September 25, 2015: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • September 25, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • September 25, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • September 24, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 24, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 24, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 24, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • September 24, 2015: [Consent Form]
  • September 24, 2015: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • September 24, 2015: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • September 22, 2015: [Order Referring Plea]
  • September 21, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 10, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 10, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 10, 2015: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • September 10, 2015: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • September 10, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 10, 2015: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • September 10, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • September 10, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • September 08, 2015: [Trial Memo]
  • September 08, 2015: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • September 08, 2015: [Order]
  • September 08, 2015: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • September 08, 2015: [In Limine ]
  • September 08, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 07, 2015: [Extension of Time]
  • September 04, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 04, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
August, 2015
  • August 28, 2015: [Order Referring Plea]
  • August 17, 2015: [Continue ]
  • August 14, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 06, 2015: [CJA 21 - Authorization to Pay]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • July 21, 2015: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 21, 2015: [Order]
  • July 17, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 17, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
  • July 13, 2015: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 08, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 08, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 08, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 08, 2015: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • July 08, 2015: [Consent Form]
  • July 08, 2015: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • July 08, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 08, 2015: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
June, 2015
  • June 22, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 18, 2015: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 16, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
  • June 15, 2015: [Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2014
  • November 20, 2014: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.