U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:09-cr-00049-14
  • Case Name: USA v. Benavides et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 03, 2021: [Passport Returned]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Passport Returned]
August, 2017
  • August 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • August 14, 2017: [Travel ]
February, 2015
  • February 03, 2015: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
November, 2014
  • November 20, 2014: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.