U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00226-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Harding
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 03, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • April 03, 2025: [Seal]
  • April 03, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 03, 2025: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Reply/Response Misc]
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • January 04, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • January 04, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
June, 2020
  • June 04, 2020: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • June 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • June 02, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • June 02, 2020: [Seal]
  • June 02, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • May 28, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 28, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • May 28, 2020: [Seal]
  • May 26, 2020: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • May 20, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • May 20, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • May 20, 2020: [Seal]
  • May 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • May 07, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 07, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
November, 2015
  • November 20, 2015: [Scheduling Conference]
July, 2015
  • July 10, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2015
  • June 23, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 23, 2015: [Seal]
  • June 23, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • June 17, 2015: [Order]
  • June 17, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
November, 2014
  • November 20, 2014: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.