U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00233-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gary
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 14, 2022: [USM Return Executed]
  • June 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 14, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • June 14, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 14, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 14, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • June 14, 2022: [Violation Report]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 20, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Transcript]
  • August 24, 2016: [Transcript]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [2255 Motion Filed]
January, 2016
  • January 21, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • January 21, 2016: [Judgment]
  • January 19, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 19, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • January 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 19, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • January 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 19, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 15, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • January 15, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 14, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 07, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2015
  • December 16, 2015: [Continue ]
November, 2015
  • November 13, 2015: [Continue ]
October, 2015
  • October 15, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 15, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 14, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • October 08, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 08, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 05, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 02, 2015: [Continue ]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • September 25, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 25, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • September 24, 2015: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 24, 2015: [Seal]
  • September 24, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • September 12, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 01, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2015
  • July 22, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 22, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 22, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 22, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 22, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 17, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2014
  • December 09, 2014: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.