U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:09-cr-00136-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Zayac et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • July 06, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • July 06, 2022: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • July 05, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • July 05, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
April, 2022
  • April 03, 2022: [Reply to Response]
March, 2022
  • March 20, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
  • March 08, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
November, 2017
  • November 15, 2017: [Transcript]
June, 2016
  • June 17, 2016: [2255 Motion Filed]
March, 2016
  • March 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 23, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2015
  • July 02, 2015: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • July 01, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
April, 2015
  • April 03, 2015: [Judgment]
December, 2014
  • December 10, 2014: [USCA Mandate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.