U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00238-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cogdell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 18, 2020: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
July, 2020
  • July 02, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • July 01, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • June 24, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 17, 2020: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • June 17, 2020: [Violation Report]
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 13, 2020: [Continue ]
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 08, 2019: [Continue ]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [USM Return Executed]
  • July 19, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • July 18, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 18, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • July 18, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 18, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 18, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 18, 2019: [Arrest ]
  • July 17, 2019: [Order]
  • July 17, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 16, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2016
  • August 19, 2016: [Transcript]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 19, 2016: [Order]
March, 2016
  • March 17, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • March 17, 2016: [Judgment]
  • March 16, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • March 11, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 09, 2016: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 07, 2016: [PS 8 Petition Action on Cond of PT Release]
  • March 07, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 07, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
November, 2015
  • November 10, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 10, 2015: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 10, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 10, 2015: [Bond]
  • November 04, 2015: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • November 04, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 04, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • November 04, 2015: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • November 03, 2015: [Status Conference]
October, 2015
  • October 18, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 01, 2015: [Order of Transfer]
  • October 01, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • September 28, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 28, 2015: [Seal]
  • September 28, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • September 18, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 04, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 04, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
August, 2015
  • August 14, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2014
  • December 11, 2014: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.