U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00234-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chase
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 17, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Passport Returned]
December, 2014
  • December 11, 2014: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.