U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:09-cr-00280-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hiraldo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 16, 2018: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • February 21, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 21, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • February 21, 2018: [Violation Report]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • December 14, 2017: [Early Termination of Probation]
August, 2017
  • August 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 01, 2017: [Order]
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [Order]
  • April 18, 2017: [Continue ]
March, 2017
  • March 17, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 13, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 13, 2017: [Continue ]
February, 2017
  • February 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 03, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2017
  • January 12, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 11, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 09, 2017: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 06, 2017: [Continue ]
June, 2016
  • June 13, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 13, 2016: [Continue ]
  • June 10, 2016: [Continue ]
March, 2016
  • March 09, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 07, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 07, 2016: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • March 07, 2016: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • March 01, 2016: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • February 25, 2016: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 24, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • February 24, 2016: [Violation Report]
  • February 16, 2016: [Summons Issued]
December, 2015
  • December 28, 2015: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • December 23, 2015: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • December 23, 2015: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 16, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • December 10, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 10, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
December, 2014
  • December 22, 2014: [Order on Motion for Reduction of Sentence (non-drug)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.