U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00244-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ortiz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • March 07, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • February 23, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 18, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 15, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 13, 2022: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • February 13, 2022: [Violation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order of Transfer]
  • November 18, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Continue ]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Continue ]
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2021
  • March 12, 2021: [Continue ]
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: [Continue ]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [USM Return Executed]
  • November 12, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 04, 2020: [Order Re: Due Process Protections Act of 2020]
  • November 04, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • November 04, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 04, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 04, 2020: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • November 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 02, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 14, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 13, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Letter]
January, 2020
  • January 06, 2020: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Letter]
March, 2018
  • March 02, 2018: [USM Return Executed]
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • February 09, 2018: [Judgment]
  • February 07, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 07, 2018: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • February 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • February 01, 2018: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • February 01, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 01, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • February 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • February 01, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 01, 2018: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • February 01, 2018: [Dismiss ]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 22, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • December 28, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • December 28, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
November, 2017
  • November 13, 2017: [Continue ]
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: [Continue ]
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • July 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 20, 2017: [Continue ]
  • July 18, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • July 18, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 06, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 06, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • May 26, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
January, 2017
  • January 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • December 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
November, 2016
  • November 08, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2016
  • September 15, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 06, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 06, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • September 06, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 06, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • September 06, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 06, 2016: [Pretrial Detention]
  • September 05, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 01, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
August, 2016
  • August 11, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
July, 2016
  • July 18, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 18, 2016: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • July 18, 2016: [Arrest - Other District]
February, 2016
  • February 11, 2016: [Indictment]
July, 2015
  • July 07, 2015: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2014
  • December 22, 2014: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.