U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Khazaee
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Early Termination of Probation]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • August 16, 2022: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • August 10, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 16, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2017
  • November 02, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Show Cause Hearing]
  • October 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 14, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 10, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • October 05, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2016
  • March 12, 2016: [Transcript]
February, 2016
  • February 16, 2016: [Index to Record on Appeal]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to proceed IFP]
  • January 14, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 08, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 06, 2016: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • January 05, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 05, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 10, 2015: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 10, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 02, 2015: [Transcript]
November, 2015
  • November 05, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 03, 2015: [Extension of Time]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • October 28, 2015: [Judgment]
  • October 27, 2015: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • October 26, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 23, 2015: [Dismiss ]
  • October 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Departure]
  • October 23, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • October 23, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 21, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • October 20, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 17, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 17, 2015: [Departure]
  • October 12, 2015: [Exhibit]
  • October 12, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 07, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 07, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • October 06, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
December, 2014
  • December 23, 2014: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.