U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:06-cr-00261-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cirino et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [USM Return Executed]
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: [Order]
May, 2019
  • May 11, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 12, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • April 12, 2019: [Violation Report]
July, 2018
  • July 16, 2018: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • July 13, 2018: [Order of Transfer]
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
December, 2016
  • December 23, 2016: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • August 24, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 08, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • August 08, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 04, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • August 04, 2016: [Violation Report]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 27, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 27, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 25, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • July 22, 2016: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Order]
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 22, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 22, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 22, 2016: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • February 22, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 18, 2016: [Violation Report]
  • February 18, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • February 17, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • February 12, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • February 12, 2016: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
July, 2015
  • July 09, 2015: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
January, 2015
  • January 26, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2014
  • December 24, 2014: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.