U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-00207-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Snape
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [2255 Motion Filed]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Transcript]
  • July 16, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
June, 2021
  • June 13, 2021: [Order]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order]
  • June 10, 2021: [USM Return Executed]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order]
  • June 09, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • June 07, 2021: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • June 07, 2021: [Violation Report]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 10, 2021: [Order Re: Due Process Protections Act of 2020]
  • May 10, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • May 10, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 10, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • May 10, 2021: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
April, 2021
  • April 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 02, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order]
  • March 17, 2021: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
February, 2021
  • February 01, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 28, 2020: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • September 15, 2020: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • August 29, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
April, 2020
  • April 09, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 06, 2020: [Calendar Entry]
March, 2020
  • March 17, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • March 17, 2020: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
May, 2018
  • May 02, 2018: [Transcript]
December, 2014
  • December 30, 2014: [Presentence Investigation Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.