U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00253-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Barile
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2016
  • October 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
September, 2016
  • September 08, 2016: [Forfeiture of Property ]
June, 2016
  • June 14, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • June 14, 2016: [Judgment]
  • June 14, 2016: [Restitution Order]
  • June 13, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • June 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 13, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • June 13, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 13, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • June 13, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 10, 2016: [Restitution Order]
  • June 08, 2016: [Order]
  • June 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 07, 2016: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 02, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
May, 2016
  • May 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • May 16, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • May 16, 2016: [Seal]
  • May 16, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [Waiver of Sentencing Time]
  • April 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 15, 2016: [Continue ]
  • April 08, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 08, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
March, 2016
  • March 17, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2016
  • February 09, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 05, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • February 05, 2016: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • February 05, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 05, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • February 05, 2016: [Information - Felony]
  • February 05, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 05, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 05, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 05, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 03, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2015
  • December 04, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 02, 2015: [Continue ]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 02, 2015: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
October, 2015
  • October 02, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
August, 2015
  • August 28, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • August 28, 2015: [Order]
  • August 27, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
June, 2015
  • June 16, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
January, 2015
  • January 12, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.