U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:09-cr-00240-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Arnold
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • August 11, 2021: [Early Termination of Probation]
December, 2020
  • December 11, 2020: [Order]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 19, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 17, 2019: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • July 15, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 03, 2019: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 02, 2019: [Continue ]
  • July 01, 2019: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 01, 2019: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2019
  • June 07, 2019: [Reply to Response]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 20, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 13, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 07, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 06, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • May 03, 2019: [Transcript]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2015
  • January 12, 2015: [Appoint Counsel re Reduction of Sentence - USSC Amendment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.