U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:07-cr-00260-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pimienta
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [Order]
  • February 11, 2016: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • February 03, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 28, 2016: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • January 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 25, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • January 25, 2016: [Violation Report]
  • January 21, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 21, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • January 21, 2016: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
January, 2015
  • January 14, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.