U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cedeno
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Transcript]
July, 2016
  • July 18, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 12, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • July 12, 2016: [Judgment]
  • July 06, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • July 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • July 06, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 06, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • July 06, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • July 06, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • July 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 03, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 01, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 01, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 16, 2016: [Continue ]
  • June 13, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • June 13, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • March 31, 2016: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • March 31, 2016: [Consent Form]
  • March 31, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 31, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 31, 2016: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • March 31, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • March 31, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 25, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 24, 2016: [Order Referring Plea]
January, 2016
  • January 12, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 12, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 07, 2016: [Continue ]
October, 2015
  • October 16, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 16, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 13, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 08, 2015: [Continue ]
August, 2015
  • August 10, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 31, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 28, 2015: [Continue ]
June, 2015
  • June 15, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2015
  • January 15, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.