U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00214-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Castagna
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Writ Returned]
  • October 12, 2022: [Writ Issued]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • September 20, 2022: [Seal]
  • September 20, 2022: [Application for Writ]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Order]
  • September 08, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • September 08, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2017
  • December 05, 2017: [Stipulation]
October, 2016
  • October 13, 2016: [Order]
  • October 07, 2016: [Stipulation]
January, 2015
  • January 16, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.