U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:09-cr-00123-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 24, 2025: [Judgment - Revocation]
  • April 14, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • April 14, 2025: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 11, 2025: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • April 11, 2025: [Violation Report]
  • April 10, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Hearing ]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • November 10, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 02, 2022: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 27, 2022: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • January 19, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 04, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • October 14, 2021: [Violation Report]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order]
  • September 28, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • September 28, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 28, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 23, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 20, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 20, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 20, 2021: [Calendar Entry]
  • September 20, 2021: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 14, 2021: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order of Transfer]
January, 2018
  • January 18, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2015
  • January 19, 2015: [Appoint Counsel re Reduction of Sentence - USSC Amendment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.