U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-00147-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Canada
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • October 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 12, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 12, 2018: [Continue ]
  • October 11, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • May 24, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 23, 2018: [Violation Report]
  • May 23, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 26, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • April 25, 2018: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • April 24, 2018: [Calendar Entry]
  • April 24, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 21, 2018: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
July, 2015
  • July 17, 2015: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
January, 2015
  • January 20, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.