U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:04-cr-00337-12
  • Case Name: USA v. Keating et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • February 20, 2020: [Travel ]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • June 27, 2017: [Early Termination of Probation]
January, 2017
  • January 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2016
  • December 31, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 12, 2016: [Order]
  • December 09, 2016: [2255 Motion Filed]
October, 2016
  • October 04, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
September, 2016
  • September 16, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 22, 2016: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • August 19, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 10, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 25, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 14, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • July 13, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
June, 2016
  • June 13, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • June 13, 2016: [Violation Report]
  • June 06, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 02, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
October, 2015
  • October 19, 2015: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • October 16, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • October 16, 2015: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • October 16, 2015: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 16, 2015: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • October 06, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 05, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 05, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2015
  • January 22, 2015: [Order of Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.