U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:07-cr-00285-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Rivera et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Order]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order of Transfer]
June, 2019
  • June 11, 2019: [Order]
  • June 05, 2019: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • May 13, 2019: [Calendar Entry]
  • May 13, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • May 13, 2019: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
  • May 09, 2019: [Electronic Filing Order]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2016
  • September 01, 2016: [Order of Transfer]
January, 2015
  • January 26, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.