U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:08-cr-00214-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Prescott
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 31, 2020: [Dismiss ]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 30, 2019: [Continue ]
  • October 16, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 16, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 16, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • October 16, 2019: [Arrest ]
  • October 16, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • February 19, 2019: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • January 03, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • January 02, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • January 02, 2019: [Seal]
  • January 02, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 02, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • January 02, 2019: [Violation Report]
December, 2018
  • December 05, 2018: [USM Return Executed]
  • December 04, 2018: [Calendar Entry]
  • December 03, 2018: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 30, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 30, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • November 28, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 27, 2018: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • November 27, 2018: [Arrest - Other District]
February, 2017
  • February 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 06, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 03, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2015
  • January 28, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.