U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-00172-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sharif
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Travel ]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Travel]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Travel ]
  • October 21, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 11, 2021: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • February 05, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2020
  • November 04, 2020: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
September, 2020
  • September 01, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • September 01, 2020: [Seal]
  • September 01, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • July 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • June 23, 2020: [Seal]
  • June 23, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 16, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 12, 2020: [Release from Custody ]
January, 2017
  • January 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 23, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 12, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 03, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 03, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 02, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 02, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2015
  • January 29, 2015: [Withdraw as Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.