U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:05-cr-00178-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bloom
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Document Forwarded to the Court of Appeals]
  • August 11, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 10, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 06, 2021: [USCA Request]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • November 17, 2020: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • November 16, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • November 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • November 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 08, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2020
  • August 12, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 14, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • July 14, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
June, 2020
  • June 03, 2020: [Reply to Response]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 27, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 27, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 27, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 21, 2020: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 20, 2020: [Order]
  • May 15, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 14, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Document Forwarded to the Court of Appeals]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • August 23, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Order]
  • June 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 12, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 10, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 21, 2019: [Continue ]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 21, 2019: [Order to Show Cause]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 03, 2019: [Order Returning Submission]
January, 2015
  • January 30, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.