U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:09-cr-00060-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Slutzkin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 01, 2025: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • May 01, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 01, 2025: [USM Return Executed]
  • May 01, 2025: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • May 01, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 01, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • May 01, 2025: [Arrest ]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 18, 2020: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 15, 2020: [Extension of Time]
  • December 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • December 04, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • December 04, 2020: [Seal]
  • December 04, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Order]
  • November 30, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • December 11, 2019: [Document Forwarded to the Court of Appeals]
  • December 10, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • December 10, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 10, 2019: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • December 10, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - USSC Amendment]
  • December 02, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 26, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 19, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 19, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 18, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 18, 2019: [Extension of Time]
  • November 13, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 04, 2019: [Order on Miscelleneous Motion re Reduction of Sentence USSC Amendment]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Order Returning Submission]
  • October 30, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 16, 2019: [Order]
  • October 10, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
May, 2019
  • May 09, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 25, 2019: [Order]
  • April 23, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 11, 2019: [Miscellaneous Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence - USSC Amendment]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2018
  • November 06, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 16, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 09, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 07, 2018: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal ]
September, 2016
  • September 15, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2016
  • April 08, 2016: [Leave to Appeal ]
December, 2015
  • December 02, 2015: [Sealed Document]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2015
  • September 11, 2015: [Index to Record on Appeal]
August, 2015
  • August 06, 2015: [Notice of Appeal - RE: Crack Cocaine 18:3582]
  • August 06, 2015: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
February, 2015
  • February 03, 2015: [Index to Record on Appeal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.