U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:06-cr-00120-6
  • Case Name: USA v. Robles et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order]
  • August 25, 2021: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • August 23, 2021: [Violation Report]
  • August 20, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 20, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 20, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • August 20, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 29, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2020
  • August 06, 2020: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • November 07, 2019: [Early Termination of Probation]
April, 2015
  • April 26, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 17, 2015: [Sealed Document]
March, 2015
  • March 15, 2015: [Appoint Counsel re Reduction of Sentence - USSC Amendment]
February, 2015
  • February 04, 2015: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PreTrial ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.