U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Burrus
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: [Order]
  • December 13, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2017
  • March 17, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 17, 2016: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • November 14, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • November 14, 2016: [Violation Report]
  • November 09, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • November 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 30, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 30, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 30, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • June 25, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 24, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 15, 2015: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 15, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 15, 2015: [Seal]
  • June 15, 2015: [Sealed Document]
February, 2015
  • February 05, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.