U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-00239-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Zaky
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 11, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: [Transcript]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • April 24, 2017: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • April 24, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 24, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 24, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • April 24, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • April 19, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 27, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 23, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • March 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 20, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 20, 2017: [Order Returning Submission]
  • March 16, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 16, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • March 13, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 13, 2017: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 08, 2017: [Order Returning Submission]
  • March 07, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 07, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 07, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 07, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 06, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • March 06, 2017: [Violation Report]
  • March 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 03, 2017: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 03, 2017: [Continue ]
February, 2017
  • February 10, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 10, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 02, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • February 02, 2017: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 27, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • December 22, 2016: [Passport Returned]
  • December 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PreTrial ]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Return of Passport]
February, 2015
  • February 06, 2015: [Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.