U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:99-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Diaz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2016
  • October 03, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
  • September 22, 2016: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • September 19, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • September 19, 2016: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • September 13, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • July 14, 2016: [Hearing ]
September, 2015
  • September 17, 2015: [Violation Report]
  • September 17, 2015: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • September 16, 2015: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
July, 2015
  • July 24, 2015: [Violation Report]
  • July 24, 2015: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
February, 2015
  • February 06, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.