U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:01-cr-00216-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Giordano
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • September 13, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Sealed Document]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Exhibit]
January, 2022
  • January 23, 2022: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • January 20, 2022: [Letter]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Sealed Document]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • September 09, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • September 02, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Exhibit]
  • July 07, 2021: [Reply to Response]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • June 14, 2021: [Withdraw Document]
  • June 14, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 13, 2021: [Reply to Response]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
  • May 25, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 15, 2021: [Continue ]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Release from Custody ]
  • December 10, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 01, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Release from Custody ]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
November, 2016
  • November 09, 2016: [Appeal Record Returned]
May, 2016
  • May 18, 2016: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • May 18, 2016: [USCA Request]
December, 2015
  • December 03, 2015: [Order]
September, 2015
  • September 21, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 16, 2015: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
February, 2015
  • February 08, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.