U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bordeaux
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
June, 2017
  • June 01, 2017: [Transcript]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 21, 2017: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • February 17, 2017: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • February 17, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • February 17, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 17, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • February 17, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • February 14, 2017: [Order]
  • February 14, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2017
  • January 04, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Witness List]
  • December 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • December 22, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • December 22, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 20, 2016: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 16, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • December 09, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 08, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • November 22, 2016: [Continue ]
  • November 16, 2016: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
  • November 11, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 07, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 14, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 07, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 19, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • August 11, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 10, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 05, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2016
  • July 08, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 07, 2016: [Continue ]
May, 2016
  • May 09, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 03, 2016: [Continue ]
March, 2016
  • March 04, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 25, 2016: [Continue ]
  • February 17, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2016
  • January 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Produce ]
  • January 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • January 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • January 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 14, 2016: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • January 13, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • January 13, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 13, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 05, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2015
  • December 29, 2015: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 17, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 11, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 08, 2015: [Order]
  • December 07, 2015: [Suppress]
  • December 07, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 07, 2015: [In Limine ]
September, 2015
  • September 04, 2015: [Order]
  • September 04, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2015
  • August 24, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 11, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • July 14, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 14, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 14, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Order]
  • June 30, 2015: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 22, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2015
  • February 09, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.