U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Herzing
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2015
  • September 02, 2015: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
August, 2015
  • August 28, 2015: [Forfeiture of Property ]
July, 2015
  • July 24, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 23, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2015
  • June 24, 2015: [Travel ]
  • June 17, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 16, 2015: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 16, 2015: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 16, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 16, 2015: [Restitution Order]
February, 2015
  • February 10, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.