U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Boggs
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 06, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
September, 2016
  • September 07, 2016: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
August, 2016
  • August 16, 2016: [Passport Returned]
  • August 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Exoneration of Bond]
  • August 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PreTrial ]
  • August 11, 2016: [Exoneration of Bond]
  • August 11, 2016: [Return of Passport]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
June, 2016
  • June 23, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • June 23, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • June 23, 2016: [Judgment]
  • June 16, 2016: [Sentencing]
April, 2016
  • April 19, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 13, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 08, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2015
  • August 21, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • August 19, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 17, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • August 10, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 06, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 06, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
February, 2015
  • February 11, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.