U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Deleon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order of Transfer]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 27, 2022: [Status Report]
  • May 27, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 15, 2022: [Violation Report]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order Re: Due Process Protections Act of 2020]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 23, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • March 23, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 23, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 23, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 23, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 10, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • November 23, 2015: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • November 23, 2015: [Judgment]
  • November 23, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • November 23, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • November 23, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 20, 2015: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • November 20, 2015: [Dismiss ]
  • November 18, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 16, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 10, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • November 10, 2015: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 09, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 09, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 09, 2015: [Forfeiture of Property ]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • October 29, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 08, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2015
  • August 28, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • August 17, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2015
  • July 20, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 17, 2015: [Order]
February, 2015
  • February 23, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.