U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:07-cr-00211-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vallombroso
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
September, 2020
  • September 11, 2020: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Compliance Review Hearing]
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2017
  • August 11, 2017: [Order]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 25, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 25, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • July 24, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 20, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • July 20, 2017: [Violation Report]
  • July 18, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 18, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 18, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • July 14, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 13, 2017: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
August, 2016
  • August 09, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 09, 2016: [Order of Transfer]
February, 2015
  • February 23, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.