U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bertnagel
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 15, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Prob 12F Modification of Monetary Condition]
  • October 24, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Restitution Order]
  • January 25, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
November, 2016
  • November 09, 2016: [Restitution Order]
June, 2016
  • June 14, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
May, 2016
  • May 16, 2016: [Writ Returned]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Exhibit]
  • April 29, 2016: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • April 14, 2016: [Extension of Time]
March, 2016
  • March 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 24, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 24, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • March 17, 2016: [Writ Returned]
February, 2016
  • February 04, 2016: [Writ Issued]
  • February 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • February 02, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • February 02, 2016: [Seal]
  • February 02, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2015
  • December 10, 2015: [Writ Returned]
October, 2015
  • October 01, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2015
  • September 08, 2015: [Writ Issued]
August, 2015
  • August 24, 2015: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • August 24, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • August 20, 2015: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • August 17, 2015: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
July, 2015
  • July 23, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • July 21, 2015: [Application for Writ]
  • July 21, 2015: [Seal]
  • July 21, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • July 17, 2015: [Writ Issued]
February, 2015
  • February 24, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.