U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reid
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • July 09, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 09, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • July 08, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 08, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • July 08, 2019: [Violation Report]
  • July 08, 2019: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • June 27, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
August, 2018
  • August 08, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2017
  • February 02, 2017: [Transcript]
January, 2017
  • January 06, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 05, 2017: [Order]
  • January 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2015
  • August 04, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 04, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 04, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 04, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • August 03, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2015
  • July 13, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 06, 2015: [Continue ]
June, 2015
  • June 16, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
February, 2015
  • February 26, 2015: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.