U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:02-cr-00188-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jamison
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 03, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2016
  • February 12, 2016: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • January 21, 2016: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • January 21, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 19, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • January 19, 2016: [Seal]
  • January 19, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 19, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 14, 2016: [Violation Report]
  • January 14, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • January 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 07, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
December, 2015
  • December 07, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
March, 2015
  • March 02, 2015: [Release from Custody ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.