U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:08-cr-00076-4
  • Case Name: USA v. Armond et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • February 11, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • February 08, 2022: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 07, 2022: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • February 07, 2022: [Violation Report]
  • February 04, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 04, 2022: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
July, 2019
  • July 17, 2019: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • June 24, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 13, 2019: [Violation Report]
  • June 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 04, 2019: [Order]
March, 2019
  • March 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • March 06, 2019: [Withdraw Document]
  • March 06, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 20, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • February 19, 2019: [USM Return Executed]
  • February 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 08, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
October, 2018
  • October 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 19, 2018: [Early Termination of Probation]
August, 2017
  • August 02, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2017
  • April 12, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • April 12, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 11, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 10, 2017: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 06, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 05, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 05, 2017: [Continue ]
  • April 05, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • April 05, 2017: [Violation Report]
March, 2017
  • March 17, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2016
  • December 27, 2016: [Transcript]
  • December 21, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 21, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 21, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2016
  • November 15, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 15, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 15, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 15, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 15, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 10, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 09, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • August 23, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 15, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • August 11, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 11, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
  • August 10, 2016: [Bond]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • July 27, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
March, 2015
  • March 03, 2015: [Early Termination of Probation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.