U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00035-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Yorkshaitis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • October 13, 2021: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • October 13, 2021: [Violation Report]
  • October 07, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 07, 2021: [USM Return Executed]
  • October 07, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 07, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • October 07, 2021: [Arrest ]
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [USM Return Executed]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 18, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 18, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • June 17, 2019: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • June 14, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 14, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • June 14, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • June 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 12, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 10, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • June 10, 2019: [Violation Report]
  • June 10, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Calendar Entry]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2015
  • March 09, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.