U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-00071-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Croce
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 16, 2017: [Dismiss ]
December, 2016
  • December 08, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
March, 2016
  • March 15, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 15, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 15, 2016: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • March 14, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 14, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • March 14, 2016: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • March 14, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • March 14, 2016: [Violation Report]
December, 2015
  • December 17, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
March, 2015
  • March 10, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.